NY S05640 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an age 55/25 temporary retirement incentive for certain public employees.
Title
Establishes an age 55/25 temporary retirement incentive for certain public employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.896 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5640A |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07354 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - print number 7354a