NY S05640 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Title
Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.167 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.553 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7592 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1394 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5640B |
2019-06-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5640A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07592 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.167