NY S05647 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes BB/S Facilities Management Corporation to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes BB/S Facilities Management Corporation to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.302 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7824a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5647B |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5647A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.802 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07824 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.302