NY S05661 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of an electronic signature on a tax return by establishing that such electronic signature has the same force and effect as if the document was actually signed.
Title
Relates to the use of an electronic signature on a tax return by establishing that such electronic signature has the same force and effect as if the document was actually signed.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1435 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A07765 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167