NY S05666 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to financing by and through the dormitory authority for the Reece School, the Reece School shall have full power and authority to assign and pledge to the dormitory authority, any and all public funds in an amount sufficient to make all payments required to be made by the Reece School to any lease, sublease or other agreement entered into between the Reece School and the dormitory authority.
Title
Relates to financing by and through the dormitory authority for the Reece School, the Reece School shall have full power and authority to assign and pledge to the dormitory authority, any and all public funds in an amount sufficient to make all payments required to be made by the Reece School to any lease, sublease or other agreement entered into between the Reece School and the dormitory authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.226 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.307 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a8133a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5666B |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5666A |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.784 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08133 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.226