NY S05667 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.146
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Iglesia Long Island Para Cristo Inc. to file an application with the assessor of the county of Nassau for a retroactive property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Iglesia Long Island Para Cristo Inc. to file an application with the assessor of the county of Nassau for a retroactive property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.146 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.685 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5667B |
2020-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.254 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | rules report cal.503 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Senate | print number 7011b |
2019-06-11 | Senate | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-05-14 | Senate | print number 7011a |
2019-05-14 | Senate | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-04-03 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7011B |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.685 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5667B |
2020-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1778 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5667A |
2019-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07011 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.146