NY S05670 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to patient counseling before issuing a prescription for a schedule II opioid; requires practitioners to consult with the patient regarding the quantity of the opioid and the patient's option to fill the prescription in a lesser quantity, and to inform the patient of the risks associated with opiate addiction and document the reason for the prescription.
Title
Relates to patient counseling before issuing a prescription for a schedule II opioid; requires practitioners to consult with the patient regarding the quantity of the opioid and the patient's option to fill the prescription in a lesser quantity, and to inform the patient of the risks associated with opiate addiction and document the reason for the prescription.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1494 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1149 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08538 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education