NY S05683 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates unreasonable fees levied on tenants for reproductions of keys by preventing landlords from charging tenants more than 110% of the actual cost for the reproduction of such keys.
Title
Eliminates unreasonable fees levied on tenants for reproductions of keys by preventing landlords from charging tenants more than 110% of the actual cost for the reproduction of such keys.
Sponsors
Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.787 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5683A |
2020-07-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08068 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - print number 8068a