NY S05685 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-06AssemblySIGNED CHAP.147
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.509
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a4853a
2019-05-15Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2019-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.686
2019-05-10SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A04853 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s5685

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback