NY S05690 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to evaluation and assistance to increase access to child care.
Title
Relates to evaluation and assistance to increase access to child care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.225 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.164 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a2315a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.771 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02315 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.225