NY S05701 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding public schools to the local assistance account.
Title
Relates to adding public schools to the local assistance account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07761 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - enacting clause stricken