NY S05703 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to commission a statewide evaluation regarding the extent of gambling by New York state residents.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to commission a statewide evaluation regarding the extent of gambling by New York state residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.576 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1567 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5703 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.319 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.319 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-23 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A591 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1567 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A00591 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - signed chap.576