NY S05707 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Details the procedure that districts must follow when dealing with disciplinary actions for bus drivers and bus drivers' assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Details the procedure that districts must follow when dealing with disciplinary actions for bus drivers and bus drivers' assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1055
2019-05-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 5707A
2019-05-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-05-13SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07998 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - print number 7998a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback