NY S05711 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5711B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 5711B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the child abuse reporting expansion act; relates to making clergy members required reporters of child abuse or mistreatment.
Title
Enacts the child abuse reporting expansion act; relates to making clergy members required reporters of child abuse or mistreatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5711B |
2020-07-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-07-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5711A |
2020-07-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06662 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES