NY S05714 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to truancy allegations in persons in need of supervision and child protective proceedings in family court.
Title
Relates to truancy allegations in persons in need of supervision and child protective proceedings in family court.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7557 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1838 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07557 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - signed chap.362