NY S05723 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - referred to cities
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting school buses from parking overnight on a city street.
Title
Relates to prohibiting school buses from parking overnight on a city street.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.139 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.895 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A04716 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to cities