NY S05731 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.312
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of overtime ceiling for members who first become members of a public retirement system of the state on or after April first, two thousand twelve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of overtime ceiling for members who first become members of a public retirement system of the state on or after April first, two thousand twelve.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.312
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.222
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7599a
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1839
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 5731A
2018-05-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-04-27SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07599 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - substituted by s5731a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05731&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05731&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05731
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05731&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05731A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5731#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5731#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5731#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5731#SC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05731&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback