NY S05737 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Niagara Frontier Transportation Authority, the Rochester-Genesee Regional Transportation Authority, the Capital District Transportation Authority and the Central New York Regional Transportation Authority and their employees to submit all unresolvable contract negotiations to binding arbitration.
Title
Requires the Niagara Frontier Transportation Authority, the Rochester-Genesee Regional Transportation Authority, the Capital District Transportation Authority and the Central New York Regional Transportation Authority and their employees to submit all unresolvable contract negotiations to binding arbitration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.227 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.195 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a5342 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.925 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05342 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.227