NY S05763 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the beneficiaries of a member of the state and local employees' retirement system who died after filing a retirement application to choose pension benefits rather than a death benefit.
Title
Authorizes the beneficiaries of a member of the state and local employees' retirement system who died after filing a retirement application to choose pension benefits rather than a death benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5763C |
2020-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5763B |
2019-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.926 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5763A |
2019-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07553 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means