NY S05766 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5766A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5766A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the fee charged for the issuance of the birth and death records in the city of Amsterdam.
Title
Relates to the fee charged for the issuance of the birth and death records in the city of Amsterdam.
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Farley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5766A |
2012-05-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08423 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - starred on calendar