NY S05766 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Eastport fire district to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes Eastport fire district to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.418 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.661 |
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7977 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1508 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07977 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5766