NY S05782 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to commercial mobile radio and cellular telephone service providers; permits the commission of public service to designate any commercial mobile radio service provider as an eligible telecommunications carrier for purposes of providing lifeline service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to commercial mobile radio and cellular telephone service providers; permits the commission of public service to designate any commercial mobile radio service provider as an eligible telecommunications carrier for purposes of providing lifeline service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.517
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a7811a
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5782A
2019-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.888
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07811 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s5782a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback