NY S05791 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes penalties for threatening, penalizing, or in any other manner discriminating or retaliating against any employee, including but not limited to contacting United States immigration authorities or otherwise threatening to report an employee's suspected citizenship or immigration status.
Title
Establishes penalties for threatening, penalizing, or in any other manner discriminating or retaliating against any employee, including but not limited to contacting United States immigration authorities or otherwise threatening to report an employee's suspected citizenship or immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.126 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.196 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a5501 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1117 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05501 (Same As) 2019-07-27 - SIGNED CHAP.126