NY S05793 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to incorporation of villages; requires a showing that incorporation is in the overall public interest.
Title
Relates to incorporation of villages; requires a showing that incorporation is in the overall public interest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.944 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5793A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07997 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments