NY S05799 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 5799
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain for-profit institutions to make annual reports to the commissioner of education and requires the commissioner to make such reports publicly available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain for-profit institutions to make annual reports to the commissioner of education and requires the commissioner to make such reports publicly available.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateAMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 5799
2019-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 5799B
2019-06-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-05-21SenatePRINT NUMBER 5799A
2019-05-21SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A07769 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - amend by restoring to original print 7769

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback