NY S05802 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the unauthorized release of sealed records.
Title
Relates to the unauthorized release of sealed records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.409 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5802A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.971 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00034 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.1