NY S05812 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Title
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.25 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.577 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1400 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5812 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.474 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-11 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A842 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1400 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A00842 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.25