NY S05815 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8006
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Title
Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8006 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.745 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1345 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08006 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled