NY S05819 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies the definition of "veteran" to also include an individual with a DD Form 214, Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies the definition of "veteran" to also include an individual with a DD Form 214, Certificate of Release or Discharge from Active Duty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.772
2019-05-20SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A07573 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback