NY S05822 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits farmers markets in state and local parks.
Title
Permits farmers markets in state and local parks.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2020-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.473 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5822A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1199 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08294 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development