NY S05829 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - signed chap.339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes Dean Pond in the county of Putnam in the list of inland waterways eligible for the local waterfront revitalization program.
Title
Includes Dean Pond in the county of Putnam in the list of inland waterways eligible for the local waterfront revitalization program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Senate | signed chap.339 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1571 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5829 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.412 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4775 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1571 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04775 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - signed chap.339