NY S05842 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5842A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5842A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to member contribution per centum increases.
Title
Relates to member contribution per centum increases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5842A |
2020-03-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07249 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - print number 7249a