NY S05849 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing cull permits to certified nuisance wildlife specialists; authorizes the department of environmental conservation, after a review of the site-specific wildlife management plan, and upon a finding that wildlife has become a nuisance, destructive to public or private property or a threat to public health or welfare, to issue a certified nuisance wildlife specialist a cull permit; defines terms.
Title
Relates to authorizing cull permits to certified nuisance wildlife specialists; authorizes the department of environmental conservation, after a review of the site-specific wildlife management plan, and upon a finding that wildlife has become a nuisance, destructive to public or private property or a threat to public health or welfare, to issue a certified nuisance wildlife specialist a cull permit; defines terms.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-25 | Senate | vetoed memo.150 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1402 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5849 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.480 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1599 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1402 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01599 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - tabled