NY S05857 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8033A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8033A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Islip, county of Suffolk to accept an application for real property tax exemption from the Family Service League, Inc.
Title
Authorizes the town of Islip, county of Suffolk to accept an application for real property tax exemption from the Family Service League, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8033A |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1253 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1627 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08033 (Same As) 2014-08-07 - signed chap.207