NY S05857 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8129C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8129C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Legal Aid Society of Northeastern New York to apply to the assessor of the city of Saratoga Springs for a retroactive real property tax exemption on a certain parcel of land.
Title
Authorizes the Legal Aid Society of Northeastern New York to apply to the assessor of the city of Saratoga Springs for a retroactive real property tax exemption on a certain parcel of land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8129C |
2016-05-18 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5857B |
2016-05-18 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.171 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1729 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5857A |
2015-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08129 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - signed chap.110