NY S05859 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the disclosure of liability of a motor vehicle lessee in the case of a total loss or the vehicle is rendered inoperable; requires disclosure of lessor policies in the case of a total loss or vehicle rendered inoperable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the disclosure of liability of a motor vehicle lessee in the case of a total loss or the vehicle is rendered inoperable; requires disclosure of lessor policies in the case of a total loss or vehicle rendered inoperable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.379
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a6748a
2019-06-05Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2019-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1201
2019-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 5859B
2019-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5859A
2019-05-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A06748 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s5859b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05859&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05859&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05859
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05859&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05859A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05859&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05859B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5859#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5859#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05859&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback