NY S05862 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6928A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6928A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates court attendants in the town of Ossining, county of Westchester as peace officers.
Title
Designates court attendants in the town of Ossining, county of Westchester as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6928A |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1840 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5862A |
2017-06-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06928 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled