NY S05864 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a television writers' and directors' fees and salaries credit; provides that to be eligible the writer or director is a minority group member, or a woman, and provides, further, that any writer or director who is a profit participant in the qualified production shall not be eligible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a television writers' and directors' fees and salaries credit; provides that to be eligible the writer or director is a minority group member, or a woman, and provides, further, that any writer or director who is a profit participant in the qualified production shall not be eligible.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.594
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a6683b
2019-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1403
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 5864A
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06683 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5864a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback