NY S05866 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7779
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an annual report on appliance and equipment energy efficiency standards and resulting energy and utility bill savings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires an annual report on appliance and equipment energy efficiency standards and resulting energy and utility bill savings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7779
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.908
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07779 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback