NY S05867 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5867B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5867B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a practitioner to consider and prescribe non-opioid treatment alternatives for treatment of neuromusculoskeletal conditions.
Title
Requires a practitioner to consider and prescribe non-opioid treatment alternatives for treatment of neuromusculoskeletal conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5867B |
2020-07-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5867A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A08256 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - amended on third reading 8256a