NY S05881 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits consent for service in the form of magnetic tape or through electronic means for certain collection procedures by the sheriff's office or an officer or employee of the department of taxation and finance.
Title
Permits consent for service in the form of magnetic tape or through electronic means for certain collection procedures by the sheriff's office or an officer or employee of the department of taxation and finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-07-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5881A |
2019-07-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A08038 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means