NY S05895 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of North Hempstead to create a townwide environmental improvement district to identify and fund the costs associated with landfill maintenance.
Title
Authorizes the town of North Hempstead to create a townwide environmental improvement district to identify and fund the costs associated with landfill maintenance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | referred to environmental conservation | |
2010-06-22 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2010-05-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-04-28 | 1ST REPORT CAL.472 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A8769-A (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation