NY S05895 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5895A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 5895A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an exemption for a retail liquor license in the county of Erie.
Title
Provides an exemption for a retail liquor license in the county of Erie.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5895A |
2018-02-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A05146 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken