NY S05898 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5898D
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898D
2019-06-17SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-06-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898C
2019-06-16SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-06-13SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898B
2019-06-13SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-06-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 5898A
2019-06-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2019-05-16SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08278 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - print number 8278c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05898&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05898D

Bill Comments

feedback