NY S05902 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5902E
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5902E
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a cost-of-living adjustment for New York public retirement systems.
Title
Provides a cost-of-living adjustment for New York public retirement systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5902E |
2020-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-03-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5902D |
2020-03-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-07-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5902C |
2019-07-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5902B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5902A |
2019-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
S05925 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES