NY S05924 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the taking of sharks; extends provisions for two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending certain provisions relating to the taking of sharks; extends provisions for two years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.427
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.995
2018-06-05Assemblysubstituted for a7633a
2018-06-04Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2018-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-08SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5924A
2018-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.984
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-19Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2017-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1901
2017-06-07SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-05SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A07633 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - substituted by s5924a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05924&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05924&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05924
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05924&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05924A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5924#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5924#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5924#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5924#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5924#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05924&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback