NY S05929 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5929A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5929A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for insurance providers and corporations to create and offer reward or incentive programs to eligible members.
Title
Allows for insurance providers and corporations to create and offer reward or incentive programs to eligible members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5929A |
2020-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09867 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - print number 9867a