NY S05934 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5934A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5934A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes liability for the death of a person caused by any act of persons permitted to use certain premises and removes liability from the owner, lessee or occupant of premises adjacent to such premises.
Title
Removes liability for the death of a person caused by any act of persons permitted to use certain premises and removes liability from the owner, lessee or occupant of premises adjacent to such premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5934A |
2020-03-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04774 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - print number 4774a