NY S05936 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.527
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.527
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the residence of the person holding the office of town superintendent of highways or town engineer of the town of Pavilion, Genesee county to be in an adjoining town or village in an adjoining town.
Title
Authorizes the residence of the person holding the office of town superintendent of highways or town engineer of the town of Pavilion, Genesee county to be in an adjoining town or village in an adjoining town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.527 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.519 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7902a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5936A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.973 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07902 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.527