NY S05945 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the department of corrections and community supervision shall provide an inmate, upon his or her discharge, with educational information about the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), instructions about how to obtain free HIV testing and referrals to community-based HIV prevention, education and counseling resources.
Title
Establishes the department of corrections and community supervision shall provide an inmate, upon his or her discharge, with educational information about the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV), instructions about how to obtain free HIV testing and referrals to community-based HIV prevention, education and counseling resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.385 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1263 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5945 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.322 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to correction |
2019-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A916 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1263 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00916 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.385